U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Natal et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 10, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 10, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 24, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 10, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 02, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • June 02, 2017: [Application for Writ]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • November 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Sealed Transcript]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.