U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Masucci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Writ Returned]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Extension of Time]
August, 2014
  • August 07, 2014: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.