U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00004-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Glover et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 10, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • March 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • June 29, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 03, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 26, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 02, 2021: [Violation Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 24, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • August 10, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 04, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • July 24, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • June 05, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 22, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 11, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • April 30, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 11, 2020: [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • March 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Exhibit]
  • March 05, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • February 12, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 03, 2020: [Violation Report]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 02, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 20, 2019: [Seal]
  • December 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 23, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 23, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • October 22, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • October 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 16, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 05, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 11, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 05, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 04, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 28, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 07, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • April 04, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 04, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • March 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 08, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2019: [Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 19, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 06, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 05, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 29, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 29, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 03, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Reconsideration]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • April 25, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 19, 2016: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
  • March 01, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [Witness List]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 12, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2015: [In Chambers Conference]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • September 18, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • September 18, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Transcript]
November, 2014
  • November 18, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 05, 2014: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
September, 2014
  • September 17, 2014: [Bond]
August, 2014
  • August 08, 2014: [2255 Motion Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.