U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Islam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 16, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 16, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2014
  • August 11, 2014: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.