U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reese
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 20, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 19, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 02, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 29, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 04, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2014
  • August 11, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.