U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Latouche et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 15, 2018: [Restitution Order]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 22, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 22, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2014
  • August 12, 2014: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.