U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Esteves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Passport Returned]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 01, 2015: [Transcript]
August, 2014
  • August 15, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.