U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00056-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Khraisat et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 06, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 06, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 06, 2022: [Dismiss ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 29, 2021: [Continue ]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Continue ]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Continue ]
  • September 03, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Continue ]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Continue ]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2019: [Continue ]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Continue ]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Continue ]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Continue ]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Continue ]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Continue ]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Continue ]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 25, 2017: [Continue ]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 18, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Travel ]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2016: [Travel ]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 25, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 11, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 11, 2015: [Travel ]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Travel ]
August, 2014
  • August 15, 2014: [Order on Motion to Travel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.