U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Reply to Response]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 13, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • May 24, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 24, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 05, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 06, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 16, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 17, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 20, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 18, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 27, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 27, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 09, 2017: [Seal]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 14, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 27, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • October 27, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • October 15, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • July 23, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • July 23, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2015
  • April 13, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
February, 2015
  • February 05, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2014
  • December 26, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 09, 2014: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2014
  • August 18, 2014: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.