U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maldonado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2016: [Status Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 14, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 14, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 14, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
August, 2014
  • August 20, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.