U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00094-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Gould et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 09, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2024: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 05, 2018: [Seal]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 12, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 25, 2016: [Return of Passport]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • February 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • January 22, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2015
  • April 03, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
February, 2015
  • February 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2014
  • August 22, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.