U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00267-15
  • Case Name: USA v. Pena et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 17, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 16, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 16, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 26, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2019: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • October 10, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 04, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • October 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 02, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • September 24, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 24, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 30, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 14, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 05, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 05, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 05, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 25, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 25, 2018: [ExParte Motion]
  • May 25, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 10, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 17, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 17, 2018: [Leave to File]
  • April 06, 2018: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 27, 2018: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - SEALED]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 21, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 21, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 05, 2016: [Leave to File]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 26, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • May 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 23, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 18, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • August 07, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 10, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Continue ]
March, 2015
  • March 05, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2014
  • December 22, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 18, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • December 05, 2014: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
October, 2014
  • October 15, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2014
  • September 26, 2014: [2255 Motion Filed]
August, 2014
  • August 22, 2014: [2255 Motion Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.