U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lesser
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 04, 2015: [Transcript]
  • October 04, 2015: [Transcript - Redacted]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order]
  • September 03, 2015: [Transcript]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 24, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 17, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 17, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 16, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 08, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 01, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 01, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 01, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2014
  • August 22, 2014: [Order for PSI and Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.