U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00269-30
  • Case Name: USA v. Colon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 30, 2021: [Violation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • February 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • November 04, 2020: [Return of Passport]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 08, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 13, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 04, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 30, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2019: [Violation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 08, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 25, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 23, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2018: [Hearing ]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 18, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 15, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 15, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • December 15, 2017: [Summons Issued]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 20, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 12, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 12, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 01, 2016: [Seal]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • September 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • August 29, 2016: [Bond]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • August 29, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • August 15, 2016: [Bond]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Remark]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 10, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 09, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • May 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 06, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 06, 2016: [Arrest ]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 11, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Alleyne Relief Motion Filed]
  • November 09, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 14, 2015: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • June 22, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2015: [Approve Associate Counsel]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2015: [Summons Issued]
December, 2014
  • December 31, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2014
  • October 23, 2014: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2014
  • August 22, 2014: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.