U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Betts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 29, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 02, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • March 28, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2014
  • August 25, 2014: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.