U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00135-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • April 27, 2022: [Conference]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 01, 2022: [Violation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Violation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 26, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 20, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 20, 2021: [Violation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 28, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 20, 2021: [Violation Report]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 23, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • August 03, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 24, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 13, 2020: [Continue ]
  • March 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 11, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • March 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 04, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 03, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
February, 2016
  • February 21, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 15, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 15, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 06, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 02, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 26, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 25, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 23, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2015
  • February 12, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2014
  • August 27, 2014: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.