U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 13, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 13, 2019: [Hearing ]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 06, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 28, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 10, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 06, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • January 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 20, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 19, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 13, 2016: [Instrument Returned]
  • December 13, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • December 09, 2016: [Instrument Returned]
  • December 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 20, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 18, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • November 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • November 17, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 16, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • November 01, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
October, 2016
  • October 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 28, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 28, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • October 13, 2016: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 05, 2016: [Witness List]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Witness List]
  • August 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 08, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • July 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 20, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 19, 2016: [Competency Hearing]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 20, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 05, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • January 25, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Suppress]
  • January 19, 2016: [Strike ]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on ExParte Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [ExParte Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
August, 2014
  • August 25, 2014: [Order on Motion for Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.