U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Casiano et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • November 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order of Transfer-USCA]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 26, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 22, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 27, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 27, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2019
  • June 30, 2019: [Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 12, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 09, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 09, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 04, 2019: [Violation Report]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 15, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 01, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 08, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 08, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 31, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 31, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 31, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 31, 2017: [Arrest ]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2014
  • August 26, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.