U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00119-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 12, 2021: [Violation Report]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • January 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • January 05, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 20, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 18, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 08, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 31, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 31, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 04, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 30, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 30, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 27, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 26, 2018: [Violation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 16, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 15, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 15, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 25, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 27, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • June 21, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • June 21, 2017: [Arrest ]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2015
  • February 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2014
  • December 16, 2014: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2014
  • August 26, 2014: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.