U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Appear]
  • November 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • June 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 17, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 15, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • May 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • May 24, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2014
  • September 18, 2014: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2014
  • August 27, 2014: [Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.