U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Voloshin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • July 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2017: [Bond]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 13, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • December 08, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 25, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Order]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 20, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 16, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2016: [Hearing ]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Extension of Time]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 29, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 31, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 31, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 31, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 31, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 31, 2016: [Arrest ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Prob 12A(1) Modification of Monetary Condition]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2014
  • August 27, 2014: [Travel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.