U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00146-9
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order]
  • November 19, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 31, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2016
  • March 06, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel re Crack Cocaine]
  • October 16, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 15, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • October 14, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • September 11, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
August, 2014
  • August 29, 2014: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.