U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eaddy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • December 23, 2019: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2019: [Bond]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 23, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 19, 2019: [Bond]
  • December 19, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Payment]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 21, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 08, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 29, 2015: [Travel ]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2014
  • August 29, 2014: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.