U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gravely
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 29, 2019: [Violation Report]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 09, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 16, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 31, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 29, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • March 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2016: [Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 08, 2016: [Extension of Time]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2014
  • August 29, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.