U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Instrument Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Passport Returned]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 13, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 29, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 28, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 18, 2017: [Seal]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2017: [Appear]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 07, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 28, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2016: [Seal]
  • July 28, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 10, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 19, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Return of Passport]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 06, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2015
  • June 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2014
  • September 02, 2014: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2014
  • August 30, 2014: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.