U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00247-11
  • Case Name: USA et al v. Muller et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 12, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 09, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Seal]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 01, 2017: [Violation Report]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 28, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 28, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 28, 2017: [Seal]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2017
  • May 13, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2016: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
  • December 08, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 09, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 13, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 17, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2014
  • September 02, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.