U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 05, 2022: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 20, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • April 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • March 07, 2022: [Approve Associate Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 14, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 25, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • September 16, 2021: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • September 16, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 16, 2021: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • September 16, 2021: [Court Exhibits]
  • September 16, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 15, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 15, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • September 13, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 13, 2021: [Acquittal]
  • September 13, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 08, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • September 03, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 27, 2021: [Frye Hearing]
  • August 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 20, 2021: [Trial Memo]
  • August 20, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 20, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 03, 2021: [Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 15, 2021: [In Limine ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • June 09, 2021: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • June 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Speedy Trial]
  • May 06, 2021: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 09, 2021: [Case Reopened]
  • March 09, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 25, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 23, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 23, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 19, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2020
  • January 20, 2020: [Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Transcript]
  • April 17, 2019: [Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 07, 2019: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • January 04, 2019: [Return of Passport]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 22, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • September 20, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 20, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 24, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Clerk's Disbursement of Funds]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 23, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 14, 2017: [Seal]
  • February 14, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 01, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2017: [Payment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 17, 2017: [Seal]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 13, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • January 11, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 05, 2017: [Instrument Returned]
  • January 05, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 28, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • December 27, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • December 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2016: [Leave to File]
  • December 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 16, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • October 26, 2016: [Travel ]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 21, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 11, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • October 04, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 28, 2016: [Travel ]
  • September 27, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Travel ]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2016: [Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • July 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2016: [Produce ]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • June 06, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • June 06, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • June 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 06, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 06, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 16, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 15, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • March 08, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • February 26, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • February 26, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 26, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Suppress]
  • January 29, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 26, 2016: [Travel ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 18, 2015: [Conflict Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 18, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Travel ]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2015: [Travel ]
  • December 16, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 08, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 07, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 02, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 25, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 25, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 20, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2015: [Payment]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 17, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 13, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 12, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 02, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 23, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Speedy Trial]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • September 28, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 28, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • September 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 23, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 23, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 23, 2015: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • September 21, 2015: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • September 17, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 17, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 17, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 17, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • September 09, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 03, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 31, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 27, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 17, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 07, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 24, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 22, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 08, 2015: [Continue ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2015
  • April 29, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2014
  • October 03, 2014: [Extension of Time]
September, 2014
  • September 08, 2014: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.