U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilkes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 12, 2023: [Violation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • October 17, 2022: [Travel ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 14, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 19, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 13, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 28, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • February 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 26, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 28, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • September 14, 2016: [Travel ]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 26, 2015: [Judgment]
  • June 26, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • June 26, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 25, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 25, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 25, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • June 25, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 25, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 18, 2015: [Letter]
September, 2014
  • September 09, 2014: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2014: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.