U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00024-3
  • Case Name: USA v. White et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 07, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 08, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 18, 2015: [Sealed Document]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • June 02, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2015
  • April 23, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2015
  • March 31, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2014
  • December 11, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
September, 2014
  • September 15, 2014: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.