U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ogunbowale
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 13, 2015: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2014
  • September 17, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.