U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00120-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Cross et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Continue ]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 09, 2022: [Violation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 12, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 08, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2014
  • September 17, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.