U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 28, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 28, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 27, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 26, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 21, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 11, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2014
  • September 17, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.