U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estevez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 16, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 16, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Order]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 05, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Continue ]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Document]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 03, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 26, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 26, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 14, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • August 01, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 22, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 20, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 15, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 12, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • July 07, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 17, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 04, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 02, 2016: [New Trial]
  • April 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 22, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 05, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 03, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 02, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 21, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 20, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2016: [Extension of Time]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 30, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 11, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 10, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2015: [Witness List]
  • December 10, 2015: [Court Exhibits]
  • December 09, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 09, 2015: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 09, 2015: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
  • December 09, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 08, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 07, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 03, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 02, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • December 02, 2015: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • December 01, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 30, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 30, 2015: [Jury Selection]
  • November 30, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 25, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • November 25, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 25, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 24, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 24, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 24, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 23, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2015: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • November 16, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 16, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • November 16, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • November 16, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 04, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • October 29, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 26, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 22, 2015: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 21, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 01, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Transcript]
  • September 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 25, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 22, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 18, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 18, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 18, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 01, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2015: [Transcript]
  • August 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
September, 2014
  • September 25, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.