U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00235-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Plummer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • February 07, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 28, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 03, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • April 13, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 04, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2014
  • September 29, 2014: [Order on Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.