U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gotta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Exoneration of Bond]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • March 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 30, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 28, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 17, 2017: [Return of Passport]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 28, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • March 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • March 20, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 14, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [ExParte Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 08, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 01, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 15, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 14, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 18, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 18, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 17, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2014
  • September 30, 2014: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.