U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Provenzano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • December 27, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Reply to Response]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 19, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 04, 2022: [Writ Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 24, 2022: [Seal]
  • June 24, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 13, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2014
  • October 01, 2014: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.