U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00197-9
  • Case Name: USA v. Soto-Solivan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2022: [Violation Report]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 11, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 04, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Vacate ]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Seal]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 28, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 28, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 28, 2020: [Arrest ]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice]
  • February 10, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • September 11, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
December, 2014
  • December 31, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2014
  • October 01, 2014: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.