U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gjuraj
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • February 17, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • January 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 18, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 27, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2019
  • September 08, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
October, 2014
  • October 01, 2014: [Index to Record on Appeal re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.