U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:98-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drao, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • April 19, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • April 17, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 30, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • March 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2018: [Seal]
  • March 28, 2018: [Application for Writ]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 25, 2017: [Seal]
  • August 25, 2017: [Application for Writ]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 08, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 15, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 15, 2016: [Application for Writ]
October, 2014
  • October 02, 2014: [Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.