U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00184-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Luciano et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 17, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 08, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 23, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 23, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 22, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 22, 2015: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2015
  • February 12, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
October, 2014
  • October 07, 2014: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.