U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mangiaracina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 24, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 24, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • September 24, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 17, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • September 17, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 02, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2014
  • October 08, 2014: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.