U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00203-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sapp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 08, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • February 01, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 01, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2014
  • October 09, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.