U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 16, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Continue ]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 26, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • February 21, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 20, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 20, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Instrument Returned]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • January 08, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • January 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2014
  • October 09, 2014: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.