U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrade et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 11, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 17, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • August 10, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 10, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • July 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 28, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 06, 2016: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 10, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 03, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • January 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 22, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 18, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 18, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 15, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 15, 2015: [Acquittal]
  • September 15, 2015: [New Trial]
  • September 14, 2015: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 10, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • September 08, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2015: [Acquittal]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • September 08, 2015: [Jury Trial]
  • September 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 04, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 03, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 02, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • September 02, 2015: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • September 02, 2015: [Jury Selection]
  • September 02, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 26, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • August 25, 2015: [Trial Memo]
  • August 25, 2015: [In Limine ]
  • August 25, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • August 10, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 10, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • August 03, 2015: [Trial Memo]
October, 2014
  • October 09, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.