U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 22, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 22, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 22, 2015: [Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Restitution Order Deadline]
  • October 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 15, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 15, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 14, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 25, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 06, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • June 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2014
  • October 09, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.