U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00202-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Islam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2021: [Seal]
  • May 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 14, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 05, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 20, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 24, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 03, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 03, 2016: [Information - Felony]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2014
  • October 10, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.