U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:98-cr-00241-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Instrument Returned]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 13, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 23, 2019: [Violation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 24, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 16, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 16, 2017: [Arrest ]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 31, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
October, 2014
  • October 14, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.