U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00264-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 08, 2022: [Transfer In/Probationer]
October, 2022
  • October 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • December 09, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 15, 2021: [Seal]
  • October 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 14, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 31, 2021: [Seal]
  • May 31, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2021: [Seal]
  • May 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 27, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • March 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • March 11, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Seal]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 24, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 13, 2020: [Case Reopened]
  • November 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: [Seal]
  • August 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 27, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 26, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 28, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 24, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 16, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 02, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 26, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 26, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • May 18, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 12, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 07, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 31, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 26, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 26, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 11, 2020: [Seal]
  • February 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • January 21, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 13, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • January 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 30, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 19, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 19, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • December 02, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 20, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 11, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 10, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 08, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 08, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 07, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • October 07, 2019: [Transcript]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • October 03, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 18, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • September 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 05, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • September 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 03, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • August 23, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • August 09, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 01, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 25, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
  • July 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 26, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • June 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 12, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Continue ]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • June 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 29, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 24, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continue ]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 12, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 05, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 04, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 03, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 11, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - USSC Amendment]
  • January 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2019: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Acknowledged Receipt of ROA]
  • November 01, 2018: [USCA Request]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 20, 2018: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order Returning Submission]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 10, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • February 10, 2017: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 05, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 29, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • May 10, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • November 13, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - RE: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 01, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Reply to Response]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 22, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • June 22, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 16, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
April, 2015
  • April 30, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2014
  • December 09, 2014: [Order]
October, 2014
  • October 14, 2014: [Reply/Response Misc]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.