U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 29, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 24, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 23, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 22, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
  • March 17, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 04, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2014
  • October 15, 2014: [Order on Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.