U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Milne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • April 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [USCA Request]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • February 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 04, 2019: [Return of Passport]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Return of Passport]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Instrument Returned]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 29, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 12, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 22, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2018: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 23, 2018: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 20, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 19, 2018: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 17, 2018: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 05, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2017: [Violation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 25, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 23, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continue]
October, 2014
  • October 20, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.